DC PR24-0247 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Resolution R24-0142, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Resolution R24-0142, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Museum of Women in the Arts Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2021
Title
National Museum of Women in the Arts Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Council | Resolution R24-0142, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006793 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0142 |
2021-06-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-06-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0247 |
2021-06-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-06-16 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-06-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0247 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-05-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |