DC PR24-0245 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Resolution R24-0291, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012571
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Resolution R24-0291, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012571
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Cora Masters Barry Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Cora Masters Barry Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Motion to Discharge (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Motion to Discharge (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Motion to Discharge (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Motion to Discharge (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-03 | Council | Resolution R24-0291, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012571 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0291 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-11-02 | Council | Motion to Discharge |
2021-05-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0245 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |