DC PR24-0244 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Resolution R24-0290, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Resolution R24-0290, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Natalie Hopkinson Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Natalie Hopkinson Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Motion to Discharge (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Motion to Discharge (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Motion to Discharge (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Motion to Discharge (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-03 | Council | Resolution R24-0290, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012570 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0290 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-11-02 | Council | Motion to Discharge |
2021-05-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0244 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |