DC PR24-0240 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Human Rights Andrew Michels Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Commission on Human Rights Andrew Michels Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Council | Withdrawn |
2021-05-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0240 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2021-05-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0240 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47186/Introduction/PR24-0240-Introduction.pdf |