DC PR24-0226 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Preservation Review Board Alexandra Jones Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Historic Preservation Review Board Alexandra Jones Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0171 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-05-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0226 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |