DC PR24-0222 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Resolution R24-0310, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013547
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Resolution R24-0310, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013547
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
2 Patterson Disposition Approval Resolution of 2021
Title
2 Patterson Disposition Approval Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | Council | Resolution R24-0310, Effective from Dec 07, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013547 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0310 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-11-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-08 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0222 |
2021-11-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-14 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-05-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0222 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |