DC PR24-0220 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution R24-0190, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution R24-0190, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Human Rights Wynter Allen Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Commission on Human Rights Wynter Allen Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Council | Resolution R24-0190, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007165 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0190 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-07-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-07-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0220 |
2021-07-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-05-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-05-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0220 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2021-04-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |