DC PR24-0219 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution R24-0189, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commission on Human Rights Adam Maier Confirmation Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on Human Rights Adam Maier Confirmation Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-23CouncilResolution R24-0189, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007164
2021-07-13CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R24-0189
2021-07-13CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-07-07CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2021-07-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-07-06CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR24-0219
2021-07-02CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-26CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2021-05-26CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2021-05-19CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR24-0219 Published in the DC Register
2021-05-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities
2021-04-26CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback