DC PR24-0201 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Amber Hewitt Chief Equity Officer Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Dr. Amber Hewitt Chief Equity Officer Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-05-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0201 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration |
2021-04-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0201 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47005/Introduction/PR24-0201-Introduction.pdf |