DC PR24-0181 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution R24-0179, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution R24-0179, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority Board of Directors Tommy Wells Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority Board of Directors Tommy Wells Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Council | Resolution R24-0179, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007155 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0179 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-07-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-07-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0181 |
2021-07-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0181 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2021-04-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |