DC PR24-0138 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution R24-0103, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005606
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution R24-0103, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005606
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Industrial Trades Michael Johnson Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Board of Industrial Trades Michael Johnson Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Council | Resolution R24-0103, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005606 |
2021-05-18 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-05-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0103 |
2021-05-12 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-04-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0138 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |