DC PR24-0110 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-26 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-26 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Public-Private Partnerships DC Smart Street Lighting Project Request for Proposals Approval Resolution of 2021
Title
Office of Public-Private Partnerships DC Smart Street Lighting Project Request for Proposals Approval Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-03-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0110 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2021-02-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0110 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/46624/Introduction/PR24-0110-Introduction.pdf |