DC PR24-0056 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Resolution R24-0025, Effective from Feb 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001844
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Resolution R24-0025, Effective from Feb 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001844
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Order Nos. 9, 12 and 14 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0041C with Blue Skye Construction, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Change Order Nos. 9, 12 and 14 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0041C with Blue Skye Construction, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Council | Resolution R24-0025, Effective from Feb 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001844 |
2021-02-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0025 |
2021-02-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-02-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |