DC PR24-0050 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Resolution R24-0020, Effective from Feb 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001838
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Resolution R24-0020, Effective from Feb 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001838
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children’s Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Children’s Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Council | Resolution R24-0020, Effective from Feb 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001838 |
2021-02-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0020 |
2021-02-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-02-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |