DC PR24-0028 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Resolution R24-0023, Effective from Feb 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001841
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifications to Contract No. CW80089 with Anchor Mental Health Association, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifications to Contract No. CW80089 with Anchor Mental Health Association, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12CouncilResolution R24-0023, Effective from Feb 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001841
2021-02-02CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R24-0023
2021-02-02CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-01-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-01-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback