DC PR24-0026 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution R24-0008, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution R24-0008, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Government Grant Transparency Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Government Grant Transparency Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Resolution R24-0008, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000793 |
2021-01-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0008 |
2021-01-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-01-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |