DC PR24-0021 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Board of Zoning Adjustment Carl Blake Confirmation Resolution of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Zoning Adjustment Carl Blake Confirmation Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2021-01-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-01-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-01-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR24-0021 Published in the DC Register
2020-12-01CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2020-11-23CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback