DC PR24-0005 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Resolution R24-0005, Effective from Jan 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00375
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Resolution R24-0005, Effective from Jan 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00375
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary to the Council of the District of Columbia Nyasha Smith Reappointment Resolution of 2021
Title
Secretary to the Council of the District of Columbia Nyasha Smith Reappointment Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | Council | Resolution R24-0005, Effective from Jan 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00375 |
2021-01-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0005 Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0005 |
2021-01-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |