DC PR24-0003 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Resolution R24-0003, Effective from Jan 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

General Counsel to the Council of the District of Columbia Nicole Streeter Reappointment Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Counsel to the Council of the District of Columbia Nicole Streeter Reappointment Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-08CouncilResolution R24-0003, Effective from Jan 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00373
2021-01-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR24-0003 Published in the DC Register
2021-01-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-01-04CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R24-0003
2021-01-04CouncilFinal Reading
2021-01-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback