DC PR23-1036 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Resolution R23-0613, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14633
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Resolution R23-0613, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14633
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Council | Resolution R23-0613, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14633 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0613 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |