DC PR23-1020 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Green Finance Authority Board Monica Ray Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Title
Green Finance Authority Board Monica Ray Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-12-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-1020 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-11-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-11-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-11-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-1020 Published in the DC Register |
2020-11-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2020-11-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-1020 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45956/Introduction/PR23-1020-Introduction.pdf |