DC PR23-0998 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-10 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-10 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Common Interest Community Virtual Meeting Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Common Interest Community Virtual Meeting Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-30 | Council | Resolution R23-0562, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12623 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0562 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-10-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |