DC PR23-0936 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Resolution R23-0509, Effective from Sep 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11314
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sense of the Council Regarding the Union Station Expansion Project Resolution of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sense of the Council Regarding the Union Station Expansion Project Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-02CouncilResolution R23-0509, Effective from Sep 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11314
2020-09-22CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0509
2020-09-22CouncilFinal Reading
2020-09-22CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0936 Published in the DC Register
2020-09-14CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback