DC PR23-0914 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Business and Workers from COVID-19 Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Protecting Business and Workers from COVID-19 Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-08-07 | Council | Resolution R23-0502, Effective from Jul 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9437 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0502 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |