DC PR23-0905 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Stacie Lee Banks Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Stacie Lee Banks Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0905 |
2020-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0905 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-07-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |