DC PR23-0901 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commission on the Arts and Humanities Maggie Fitzpatrick Confirmation Resolution of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on the Arts and Humanities Maggie Fitzpatrick Confirmation Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-27CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-10-02CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-31CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0901 Published in the DC Register
2020-07-28CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2020-07-27CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback