DC PR23-0899 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Resolution R23-0508, Effective from Sep 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11312
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Resolution R23-0508, Effective from Sep 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11312
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 5, 6, and 7 to Contract No. CW64063 with Health IT 2 Business Solutions LLC dba CODICE Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Modification Nos. 5, 6, and 7 to Contract No. CW64063 with Health IT 2 Business Solutions LLC dba CODICE Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Council | Resolution R23-0508, Effective from Sep 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11312 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0508 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |