DC PR23-0892 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Resolution R23-0553, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13302
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Resolution R23-0553, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13302
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council Woodrow Wilson High School Renaming Protocol Resolution of 2020
Title
Sense of the Council Woodrow Wilson High School Renaming Protocol Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0553, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13302 |
2020-10-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0553 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0892 |
2020-09-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0892 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-07-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |