DC PR23-0889 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Resolution R23-0487, Effective from Jul 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Resolution R23-0487, Effective from Jul 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
RPP Voluntary Exclusion Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
RPP Voluntary Exclusion Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Council | Resolution R23-0487, Effective from Jul 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9179 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |