DC PR23-0862 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Resolution R23-0473, Effective from Jul 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Resolution R23-0473, Effective from Jul 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW72868 and Modification No. 1 to Contract No. CW72868 with Genuine Parts Company (dba NAPA Auto Parts or NAPA) Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Contract No. CW72868 and Modification No. 1 to Contract No. CW72868 with Genuine Parts Company (dba NAPA Auto Parts or NAPA) Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Council | Resolution R23-0473, Effective from Jul 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9171 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0473 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |