DC PR23-0786 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This approval resolution extends the Council's review period for CA 23-479 to 45 days starting on Thursday, April 2, 2020. The proposed contract will be deemed approved on Sunday, May 17, 2020, unless the Council adopts a disapproval or approval resolution prior to that time.
Withdrawn on May 5, 2020.
Title
Sagitec Solutions, LLC Contract No. CW75765 Disapproval Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Council | Withdrawn |
2020-05-05 | Council | Agendized - Not considered |
2020-04-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0786 Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0786 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44550/Introduction/PR23-0786-Introduction.pdf |