DC PR23-0773 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adams Morgan Business Improvement District Amendment Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Adams Morgan Business Improvement District Amendment Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-03-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0383, Effective from Mar 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3548 |
2020-03-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0383 |
2020-03-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-03-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |