DC PR23-0767 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Resolution R23-0557, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12615
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Resolution R23-0557, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12615
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised ABRA Civil Penalty Schedule Resolution of 2020
Title
Revised ABRA Civil Penalty Schedule Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-30 | Council | Resolution R23-0557, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12615 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0557 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0767 |
2020-10-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0767 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-03-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |