DC PR23-0759 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Resolution R23-0581, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13460
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Resolution R23-0581, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13460
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Council review period tolled pursuant to Bill 23-733.
Title
Commission on Human Rights Brian Griffey Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | Council | Resolution R23-0581, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13460 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0581 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0759 |
2020-10-16 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-09-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0759 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2020-03-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |