DC PR23-0724 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Directors of the Tobacco Settlement Financing Corporation Angela D. Joyner Appointment Resolution of 2020
Title
Board of Directors of the Tobacco Settlement Financing Corporation Angela D. Joyner Appointment Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0724 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0724 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44268/Introduction/PR23-0724-Introduction.pdf |