DC PR23-0698 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nomination approved pursuant to Bill 23-733.
Title
Chief Procurement Officer of the Office of Contracting and Procurement George Schutter Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2020-02-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0698 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0698 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44199/Introduction/PR23-0698-Introduction.pdf |