DC PR23-0667 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Resolution R23-0337, Effective from Feb 04, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Resolution R23-0337, Effective from Feb 04, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 7 and 8 to Contract No. CW56527 with Purfoods, LLC dba Mom's Meals Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Modification Nos. 7 and 8 to Contract No. CW56527 with Purfoods, LLC dba Mom's Meals Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Council | Resolution R23-0337, Effective from Feb 04, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1442 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0337 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |