DC PR23-0661 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Resolution R23-0356, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2700
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Resolution R23-0356, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2700
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Latin Public Charter School Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2020
Title
Washington Latin Public Charter School Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0356, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2700 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0356 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-02-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0661 |
2020-02-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-02-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-01-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0661 Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |