DC PR23-0647 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rulemaking for Paid Family Leave Benefits Approval Resolution of 2020
Title
Rulemaking for Paid Family Leave Benefits Approval Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-01-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-01-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0647 Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0647 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43947/Introduction/PR23-0647-Introduction.pdf |