DC PR23-0645 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Resolution R23-0342, Effective from Feb 14, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1450
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Resolution R23-0342, Effective from Feb 14, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1450
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council in Support of the Langston Initiative Resolution of 2020
Title
Sense of the Council in Support of the Langston Initiative Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Council | Resolution R23-0342, Effective from Feb 14, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1450 |
2020-02-14 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0342 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-01-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0645 Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |