DC PR23-0585 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Access to Body Worn Camera Footage Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Access to Body Worn Camera Footage Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-12-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0284, Effective from Dec 03, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16211 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0284 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-12-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |