DC PR23-0562 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical Marijuana Plant Count Elimination Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana Plant Count Elimination Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-03CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-11-29CouncilResolution R23-0274 Effective from November 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15708
2019-11-19CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0274
2019-11-19CouncilFinal Reading
2019-11-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback