DC PR23-0561 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - Resolution R23-0325, Effective from Jan 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - Resolution R23-0325, Effective from Jan 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Howard University Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2019
Title
The Howard University Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Council | Resolution R23-0325, Effective from Jan 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 768 |
2020-01-21 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0325 |
2020-01-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0561 |
2019-12-18 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-12-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0561 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-11-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |