DC PR23-0555 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Resolution R23-0278, Effective from Dec 03, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Resolution R23-0278, Effective from Dec 03, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council Supporting the Protection of Immigrant Families Resolution of 2019
Title
Sense of the Council Supporting the Protection of Immigrant Families Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0278, Effective from Dec 03, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16201 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0278 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-11-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0555 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |