DC PR23-0537 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Director of the Office on Returning Citizens Affairs Lamont Carey Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Director of the Office on Returning Citizens Affairs Lamont Carey Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-02-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0537 |
2020-01-23 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-01-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0537 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2019-10-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0537 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43515/Introduction/PR23-0537-Introduction.pdf |