DC PR23-0512 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Resolution R23-0272, Effective from Nov 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Resolution R23-0272, Effective from Nov 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors Max Brown Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors Max Brown Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0272, Effective from Nov 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16196 |
2019-11-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0272 |
2019-11-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-11-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-11-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0512 |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0512 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-10-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |