DC PR23-0495 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution R23-0234, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13947
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution R23-0234, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13947
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Activity Fund Theatrical and Music Performance Expenditures Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Student Activity Fund Theatrical and Music Performance Expenditures Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | Council | Resolution R23-0234, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13947 |
2019-10-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0234 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-10-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |