DC PR23-0493 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
MLK Gateway Real Property Tax Abatement Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
MLK Gateway Real Property Tax Abatement Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-18 | Council | Resolution R23-0224, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13543 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0224 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-10-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |