DC PR23-0481 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Executive Director of the Office on African Affairs Aly Kaba Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Executive Director of the Office on African Affairs Aly Kaba Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0481 |
2019-10-31 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0481 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0481 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43323/Introduction/PR23-0481-Introduction.pdf |