DC PR23-0474 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution R23-0229, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13937
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution R23-0229, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13937
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 4, 5, 6, 7 and 8 to Contract No. CW58761 with Cradle Systems, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Modification Nos. 4, 5, 6, 7 and 8 to Contract No. CW58761 with Cradle Systems, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | Council | Resolution R23-0229, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13937 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0229 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-10-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |